Jeremiah v. Gateway Blend, LLC

Plaintiff: Stefan Jeremiah
Defendant: Gateway Blend, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00535
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, on the Court's own motion, that the Rule 16 Conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, July 17, 2019 at 10:30 a.m., pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, will now be heard in chambers 14-North on Wednesday, July 24, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel who will try the case are required to attend in-person. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Rule 16 Conference set for 7/24/2019 01:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen R Clark Sr.. Signed by Honorable Stephen R Clark, Sr on 7/12/2019. (CLO)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. . (Mendez, Jessica)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica M. Mendez for Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Mendez, Jessica)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/10/19. (JAB)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/10/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/17/2019 10:30 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/7/2019. (JMC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gateway Blend, LLC.(Petite, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Gateway Blend, LLC.(Petite, John) Modified on 6/4/2019 (CSG) - deleted as incomplete document, refiled as document #12.
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Petite, John) filed by Gateway Blend, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/29/2019. (JMC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Petite, John)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Petite, John) filed by Gateway Blend, LLC; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/14/19. (CSG)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Petite, John) filed by Gateway Blend, LLC; GRANTED ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/13/19. (CSG)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Petite, John)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Petite, John) filed by Gateway Blend, LLC; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/16/19. (CSG)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Petite, John)
March 20, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard Liebowitz. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (BAK)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Stefan Jeremiah Process Server: Missouri Process Serving (Liebowitz, Richard)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Gateway Blend, LLC with receipt number 0865-7101206, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Stefan Jeremiah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeremiah v. Gateway Blend, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Blend, LLC
Represented By: Jessica M. Mendez
Represented By: John E. Petite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Jeremiah
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?