Cathcart v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Constance Cathcart
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv00540
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support of Complaint. For the reasons stated in the Motion, Plaintiff's Brief is due no later than July 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 07/01/2019. (EMD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Complaint by Plaintiff Constance Cathcart. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT of Certified Administrative Hearing held on March 9, 2018 re #9 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 transcript 1, #2 transcript 2, #3 transcript 3, #4 transcript 4, #5 transcript 5, #6 transcript 6, #7 transcript 7, #8 transcript 8, #9 transcript 9, #10 transcript 10, #11 transcript 11, #12 transcript 12, #13 transcript 13, #14 transcript 14, #15 transcript 15, #16 transcript 16, #17 transcript 17, #18 transcript 18, #19 transcript 19, #20 transcript 20, #21 transcript 21)(Rund, Jane)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Rund, Jane)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA filed; SSA Office of General Counsel served on 3/26/2019. (Van Fossan, Kristen) Modified on 5/10/2019 (MRS).
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Constance Cathcart. SSA Office of General Counsel served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Constance Cathcart. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Constance Cathcart. Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge (MRS)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, Administrative Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/12/2019. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 3/22/19. (MRS)
March 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Kristen Van Fossan. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (MFG)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number 0865-7103356, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Constance Cathcart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Nancy Berryhill, #4 Summons William Barr, #5 Summons Jeffrey Jensen)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cathcart v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Cathcart
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?