Fink v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Chris Fink
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv00827
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Plaintiff Chris Fink. (CLO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT of Certified Administrative Hearing held on May 18, 2017 re #11 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 transcript 1, #2 transcript 2, #3 transcript 3, #4 transcript 4, #5 transcript 5, #6 transcript 6, #7 transcript 7, #8 transcript 8, #9 transcript 9)(Rund, Jane)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Rund, Jane)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Tue Jun 18 10:29:10 CDT 2019 (Kratzer, Katie)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane) filed by Nancy A. Berryhill; ORDERED GRANTED. Answer now due on or before July 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 6/18/19. (KEK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Chris Fink. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. United States Attorney served. (KEK)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Chris Fink. (KEK)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
April 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (NEP)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4,5. Mon Apr 15 14:31:21 CDT 2019 (Phillips, Nicole)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 4/15/2019. (NEP)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 4/15/2019. (NEP)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
April 9, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Apr 9 15:00:38 CDT 2019 (admin,)
April 9, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG)
April 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Chris Fink. (MFG)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Chris Fink. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Electronic Filing from Southern District of IL, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fink v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?