Board of Trustees of the Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan et al v. Columbia Maintenance Company

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan and Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan
Defendant: Columbia Maintenance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00898
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the counsel for the parties must file a joint report, no later than Monday, July 15, 2019, telling the Court what steps they intend to take to move this case forward, one way or another. (Response to Court due by 7/15/2019.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on July 9, 2019. (BRP)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: as to Columbia Maintenance Company Re: #9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Columbia Maintenance Company ; ORDERED :Motion is GRANTED. Columbia Maintenance Company answer due 6/17/2019. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on June 4, 2019. (MCB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Columbia Maintenance Company. (Pajda, Danielle)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/30/19. (CDP)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Columbia Maintenance Company. (Pajda, Danielle)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Danielle Ashley Pajda for Defendant Columbia Maintenance Company. (Pajda, Danielle)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Board of Trustees of the Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan, Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan. Columbia Maintenance Company served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Leppert, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Matthew B. Leppert. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda K. Hansen for Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan, Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan. (Hansen, Amanda)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan, Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan Process Server: Dahlberg & Associates (Leppert, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew B. Leppert for Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan, Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan. (Leppert, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Columbia Maintenance Company with receipt number 0865-7140602, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Board of Trustees of the Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan, Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Leppert, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan et al v. Columbia Maintenance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Maintenance Company
Represented By: Danielle Ashley Pajda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contract Cleaners Service Employees Pension Plan
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?