Callahan v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Callahan
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01051
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 04/30/2019. (AAS)
April 30, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to David D. Camp. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number 0865-7179414, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Kenneth R. Callahan. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Camp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callahan v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Callahan
Represented By: David D. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?