Kuehl v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Gerold Kuehl
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01197
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Gerold Kuehl. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (KKS)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
May 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons were hand delivered to USMS. (KKS)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4; Social Security Appeal. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/7/19. (KKS)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/7/19. (KKS)
May 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Gerold Kuehl. (BAK)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gerold Kuehl. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA23)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Gerold Kuehl. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form original filing form, #2 Summons Nancy Berryhill, #3 Summons US Attorney General (**), #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Van Fossan, Jennifer) **Incorrect plaintiff name listed on Summons, name was corrected when summons issued on 5/7/19 (KKS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuehl v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerold Kuehl
Represented By: Jennifer M. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?