Oliphant v. Midland Funding LLC
Plaintiff: Carl Oliphant and Mohammed Jaber
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01204
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiffs Mohammed Jaber, Carl Oliphant. (Roberts, Christopher) filed by Mohammed Jaber, Carl Oliphant; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/1/19. (KEK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiffs Mohammed Jaber, Carl Oliphant. (Roberts, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Briefs ;Extension to file the following: Reply brief in support of their Motion to Remand and memorandum in opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss ;Proposed extension date 06/28/2019 by Plaintiffs Mohammed Jaber, Carl Oliphant. (Roberts, Christopher) filed by Mohammed Jaber, Carl Oliphant ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/14/19. (ARL)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Briefs ;Extension to file the following: Reply brief in support of their Motion to Remand and memorandum in opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss ;Proposed extension date 06/28/2019 by Plaintiffs Mohammed Jaber, Carl Oliphant. (Roberts, Christopher)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis filed by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Jaber State Court Summons, #2 Ex 2 - Oliphant State Court Summons)(Dickinson, Joshua)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Jaber State Court Summons, #2 Ex 2 - Oliphant State Court Summons)(Dickinson, Joshua)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal)(Dickinson, Joshua)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis , MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Proposed extension date June 5, 2019 by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua) filed by Midland Funding, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/29/19. (ARL)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis , MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Proposed extension date June 5, 2019 by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Respond to Motion to Remand #7 by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua) filed by Midland Funding, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/15/19. (ARL)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Respond to Motion to Remand #7 by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed Jaber, Carl Oliphant. (Butsch, David)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis by Plaintiffs Carl Oliphant, Mohammed Jaber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet)(Butsch, David)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by David T. Butsch for Plaintiff Carl Oliphant. (Butsch, David)
May 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Carl Oliphant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MFG)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Midland Funding LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Dickinson, Joshua)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Midland Funding LLC. Parent companies: Encore Capital Group, Inc., Subsidiaries: Member: Midland Portfolio Services, Inc., Publicly held company: Encore Capital Group, Inc.,. (Dickinson, Joshua)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC00679, with receipt number 0865-7195836, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Midland Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dickinson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliphant v. Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Oliphant
Represented By: Christopher E. Roberts
Represented By: David T. Butsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Jaber
Represented By: Christopher E. Roberts
Represented By: David T. Butsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?