Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO et al v. FE Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Local 513 Pension Fund and Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: K-Com Environmental, K-Com Transport Services and FE Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01209
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for default judgment is GRANTED. JUDGMENT is hereby entered against K-Com in the amount of $64,986.87 representing $52,401.49 in principal, $10,480.30 in liquidated damages, $1,650.00 in attorneys fees and $455.08 costs. (cc: Defendant K-Com Environmental) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 7/3/19. (KJS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Party K-Com filed by Plaintiffs Local 513 Pension Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Duffy Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 to Duffy Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 to Duffy Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 2 to Duffy Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 3 to Duffy Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 4 to Duffy Affidavit, #7 Affidavit Faul Affidavit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Faul, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Party K-Com by Plaintiffs Local 513 Pension Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington. (Faul, James)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Unopposed) by Defendant FE Group, LLC. (Solverud, Erik) filed by FE Group, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/7/19. (KJS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant K-Com Environmental (cc: Defendant) (KJS)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Unopposed) by Defendant FE Group, LLC. (Solverud, Erik)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: as to FE Group, LLC Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by FE Group, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. (FE Group, LLC answer due 6/10/2019.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/4/19. (KJS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against K-Comonly by Plaintiffs Local 513 Pension Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Faul, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Defendant FE Group, LLC. (Kelso, Alissa)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Alissa B Kelso for Defendant FE Group, LLC. (Kelso, Alissa)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Erik O. Solverud for Defendant FE Group, LLC. (Solverud, Erik)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Timothy J. Sappington(in his Representative capacity as President & Business Manager), Timothy J. Sappington(in his capacity as Chairman of the Board of Trustee of Plaintiff Funds), Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund. FE Group, LLC served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Faul, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Timothy J. Sappington(in his Representative capacity as President & Business Manager), Timothy J. Sappington(in his capacity as Chairman of the Board of Trustee of Plaintiff Funds), Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund. K-Com Environmental served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Faul, James)
May 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney James P. Faul. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Local 513 Pension Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc. (BAK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Local 513 Pension Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington Process Server: Wilson & Associates (BAK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-7197299, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Timothy J. Sappington(President & Business Manager), Timothy J. Sappington(Chairman of the Board of Trustee of Plaintiff Funds), Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons - FE Group, LLC, #4 Summons Summons - K-Com Environmental, et al.)(Faul, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO et al v. FE Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Com Environmental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Com Transport Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FE Group, LLC
Represented By: Alissa B Kelso
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Annuity Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Sappington
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 513 Pension Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?