Shurtz v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Rayce L. Shurtz
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01218
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT of Certified Administrative Hearing held on December 13, 2017 re #9 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 transcript 1, #2 transcript 2, #3 transcript 3, #4 transcript 4, #5 transcript 5, #6 transcript 6, #7 transcript 7, #8 transcript 8, #9 transcript 9, #10 transcript 10, #11 transcript 12, #12 transcript 13)(Llewellyn, Nicholas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Llewellyn, Nicholas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Rayce L. Shurtz. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (MCB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS along with a copy of complaint and USM 285 form. (MCB)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See CMO for complete details.) This case is assigned to Track: 4. Pursuant to Rule 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on May 13, 2019. (MCB)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on May 13, 2019. (MCB)
May 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Rayce L. Shurtz. (BAK)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rayce L. Shurtz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial CJA23)(Severs, Traci)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Rayce L. Shurtz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Jeffrey Jensen, #4 Summons Nancy Berryhill, #5 Summons William Barr)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shurtz v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayce L. Shurtz
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?