Meyers v. Ascension Health Alliance et al
Plaintiff: Christine M Meyers and Christine M. Meyers
Defendant: Ascension Health Alliance, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. and Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01222
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel Robert Ritter for Defendants Ascension Health Alliance, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Ritter, Daniel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy L. Blaisdell for Defendants Ascension Health Alliance, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Blaisdell, Amy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christine M. Meyers Ascension Health Alliance waiver signed on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Davis, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christine M. Meyers Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. waiver signed on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Davis, Matthew)
May 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 2. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Ascension Health Alliance, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. with receipt number 0865-7202851, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Christine M Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service Ascension, #4 Waiver of Service Sedgwick)(Davis, Matthew) Modified on 5/13/2019 (MFG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. Ascension Health Alliance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Health Alliance
Represented By: Amy L. Blaisdell
Represented By: Daniel Robert Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. Blaisdell
Represented By: Daniel Robert Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine M Meyers
Represented By: Matthew R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine M. Meyers
Represented By: Matthew R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?