United States of America v. $30,000.00 U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $30,000.00 U.S. Currency
Claimant: Jerry Dupree, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01224
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Claim of Exemption by Defendant $30,000.00 U.S. Currency (Attachments: #1 Attachment letter from Brian Silber)(KEK)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MARSHAL Return Executed party servedJerry Dupree, Sr., Type of return Complaint and Notice, Mailed Certified; Delivered, Left with individual. (CLO)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted party served Jerry Dupree, Sr., Type of return Complaint and Notice, Mailed Certified; Notice Left, no authorized recipient available. (CLO)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Unexecuted party served Jerry Dupree, Jr., Type of return Complaint and Notice, Mailed certified; left notice no authorized recipient available. (CLO)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed; party served: Jerry Dupree, Jr., Type of return: Complaint and Notice; Delivered by certified mail on 5/18/19. (KXS)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed; Type of return: Complaint and Notice; Certified mail delivered on 5/20/19. (KXS)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed. Type of return Complaint/Warrant. (ARL)
May 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG)
May 13, 2019 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant$30,000.00 U.S. Currency. (MFG)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $30,000.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $30,000.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,000.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lindsay L. McClure-Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jerry Dupree, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?