Allerdissen v. Medical Commercial Audit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeramy D Allerdissen and Jeramy Allerdissen
Defendant: Medical Commercial Audit, Inc and Medical Commercial Audit, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01291
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/15/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/23/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 7/11/2019. (AFC)
June 25, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Jeramy Allerdissen, Defendant Medical Commercial Audit, Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/2/2019. (CBL)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jeramy Allerdissen. Medical Commercial Audit, Inc. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Graypel, Boris)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Medical Commercial Audit, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Barton, Dennis)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Medical Commercial Audit, Inc..(Barton, Dennis)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Dennis J. Barton, III for Defendant Medical Commercial Audit, Inc.. (Barton, Dennis)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David M. Barshay by Plaintiff Jeramy Allerdissen. ORDERED: GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 5/29/2019. (CBL)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David M. Barshay. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7238230) by Plaintiff Jeramy Allerdissen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barshay, David)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Boris E. Graypel. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jeramy Allerdissen Process Server: William Stage (MFG)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Medical Commercial Audit, Inc with receipt number 0865-7206926, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jeramy D Allerdissen. (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Process Server Request Form)(Graypel, Boris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allerdissen v. Medical Commercial Audit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Commercial Audit, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Commercial Audit, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Barton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramy D Allerdissen
Represented By: Boris E. Graypel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramy Allerdissen
Represented By: David Michael Barshay
Represented By: Boris E. Graypel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?