National Roofing Industry Pension Plan et al v. Jourdain Roofing Company

Plaintiff: National Roofing Industry Pension Plan, United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers and Allied Workers, Local Union No. 2, AFL-CIO, Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund and Kinsey Robinson
Defendant: Jourdain Roofing Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01305
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Motion to Join Parties due by 10/28/2019. Discovery Completion due by 3/27/2020. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 4/7/2020. ADR Future Reference 2/14/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/24/2020. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 8/19/2020. Motion in Limine due by 8/29/2020.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/1/2019. (AFC)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference, previously scheduled for July 12, 2019 at 11:30 a.m., is CANCELED. The Court will issue a Case Management Order based upon the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/26/19. (JEB)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs National Roofing Industry Pension Plan, Kinsey Robinson, Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund, United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers and Allied Workers, Local Union No. 2, AFL-CIO. . (Gierse, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Two Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/5/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/12/2019 11:30 AM in Chambers 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 06/13/2019. (KCB)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Jourdain Roofing Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Miller, Todd)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jourdain Roofing Company.(Miller, Todd)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Todd A. Miller on behalf of the Defendant [ECF No. 6] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/11/19. (ALM)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Todd A. Miller. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7268722) by Defendant Jourdain Roofing Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Miller, Todd)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers and Allied Workers, Local Union No. 2, AFL-CIO, National Roofing Industry Pension Plan, Kinsey Robinson, Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund. All Defendants. (Gierse, Matthew)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Megan M. Moore on behalf of the Defendant [ECF No. 3] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/5/19. (ALM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Megan Moore. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7255652) by Defendant Jourdain Roofing Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Moore, Megan)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Matthew J. Gierse. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs National Roofing Industry Pension Plan, Kinsey Robinson, Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund, United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers and Allied Workers, Local Union No. 2, AFL-CIO Process Server: John Frederick Investigations (Gierse, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Jourdain Roofing Company with receipt number 0865-7207705, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers and Allied Workers, Local Union No. 2, AFL-CIO, National Roofing Industry Pension Plan, Kinsey Robinson, Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Summons , #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Civil Cover Sheet )(Gierse, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Roofing Industry Pension Plan et al v. Jourdain Roofing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Roofing Industry Pension Plan
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Union of Roofers, Waterproofers and Allied Workers, Local Union No. 2, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roofers and Waterproofers Research and Education Joint Trust Fund
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinsey Robinson
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jourdain Roofing Company
Represented By: Megan Marie Moore
Represented By: Todd A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?