Hotze-Smith v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Plaintiff: Emma Hotze-Smith
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 4:2019cv01393
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 SURREPLY to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily without prejudice filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (AFC)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (ECF No. 18) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file the attached sur-reply and exhibit (ECF No. 18-1) separately. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/25/19. (THL)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moothart, Bruce)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference, previously set for June 28, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., is CANCELED. The Court will issue a Case Management Order, if necessary, after it rules on the pending motions to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/24/19. (THL)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily without prejudice filed by Plaintiff Emma Hotze-Smith. (Wright, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Emma Hotze-Smith. Proposed Plan - Track 2: Standard. (Wright, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily without prejudice filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Moothart, Bruce)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily without prejudice by Plaintiff Emma Hotze-Smith. (Wright, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss :Count III of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Damages filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2-12-13 Order)(Moothart, Bruce)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss :Count III of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Damages filed by Plaintiff Emma Hotze-Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wright, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/21/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 6/28/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/29/2019. (AFC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss :Count III of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Damages filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Moothart, Bruce)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss :Count III of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Damages by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Moothart, Bruce)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Moothart, Bruce)
May 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Emma Hotze-Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MFG)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Emma Hotze-Smith.(MFG)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Plaintiff of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Efiling confirmation)(Moothart, Bruce)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. Parent companies: Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Safeco Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Moothart, Bruce)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Jury Demand from City of St. Louis, Missouri Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC00749, with receipt number 0865-7224557, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Process and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Melissa Miller, #3 Exhibit C - Efiling confirmation, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moothart, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hotze-Smith v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Hotze-Smith
Represented By: Christopher Allen Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Bruce A. Moothart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?