Krawczyk v. Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Krawczyk
Defendant: AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., YP Western Directory LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., YP Advertising & Publishing LLC, YP Holdings, LLC, AT&T Inc, YP Shared Services, LP, Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. and YP LLC
Trustee: John P. Vaclavek
Case Number: 4:2019cv01399
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)
May 22, 2019 Filing 180 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:16-cv-02531. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
May 21, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE. The Clerk is ordered to Transfer Action to the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on May 21, 2019. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 178 Response re #177 Objection byJohn P. Vaclavek. (Warfield, David) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 177 OBJECTIONS to re #176 Order to Transfer Case by James Krawczyk. (Post, Russell) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/7/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 175 STIPULATION Re Motion To Transfer Venue And Continuing Hearing filed by John P. Vaclavek. (Warfield, David) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 174 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Telephonic Further Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2019. The parties are set for mediation in Missouri on 5/1/2019. If the mediation is unsuccessful, plaintiff plans to file a motion to transfer venue. Motion to Transfer Venue due by 5/7/2019. Motion Hearing on Motion to Transfer Venue set for 6/19/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Richard Mithoff, Judith Sadler, and Russell Post. Defendant Attorney: Julie Totten and Marc Levinson for AT&T and YP; David Warfield for Chapter 11 Trustee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 173 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John P. Vaclavek. (Warfield, David) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 172 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Telephonic Further Case Management Conference held on 1/15/2019. The parties are still waiting on resolution to the motion for withdrawal of reference in the bankruptcy court in Missouri. Updated Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2019. Telephonic Further Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 02:30 PM. Plaintiff shall provide the Court and all other parties a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than three court days prior to the case management conference by way of email to the Court (vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov) with a cc to opposing counsel. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Richard Mithoff, Judith Sadler, Russell Post, and Bonnie Claire.Defendant Attorney: Julie Totten and Marc Levinson for AT&T, et al.; David Warfield for Chapter 11 Trustee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 171 THIRD JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John P. Vaclavek. (Warfield, David) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
September 25, 2018 Filing 170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/25/2018. Mediation in St. Louis completed and the parties are waiting for the matter to be referred back here for adjudication. Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2019. Telephonic Further Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2019 02:30 PM. Plaintiff shall provide the Court and all other parties a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than three court days prior to the case management conference by way of email to the Court (vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov) with a cc to opposing counsel. Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Russell Post and Mark Molumphy. Defendant Attorney: Julie Totten and Marc Levinson for AT&T David Warfield by telephone for Chapter 11 Trustee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2018)
September 15, 2018 Filing 169 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John P. Vaclavek. (Warfield, David) (Filed on 9/15/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 168 STATUS REPORT by John P. Vaclavek. (Warfield, David) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 167 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by James Krawczyk (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018) Modified on 5/23/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2018 Filing 166 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING AN IN PERSON FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 165 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John P. Vaclavek re #164 Status Report (Joint) (Warfield, David) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 164 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by John P. Vaclavek. (Warfield, David) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 163 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING DEADLINE FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 1/18/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
September 11, 2017 Filing 162 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Advertising, LP, YP Advertising & Publishing LLC Supplemental (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 161 Certificate of Interested Entities by YP LLC, YP Shared Services, LP Supplemental (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 160 Certificate of Interested Entities by YP Holdings, LLC Supplemental (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying without prejudice #144 Motion to Transfer Case. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 158 REPLY (re #144 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byJohn P. Vaclavek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Transcript January 9, 2017 hearing, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of David A. Warfield)(Warfield, David) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 157 Request for Judicial Notice re #156 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byAT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Advertising & Publishing LLC, YP Holdings, LLC, YP LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) #156 ) (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 156 REPLY (re #144 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byAT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Advertising & Publishing LLC, YP Holdings, LLC, YP LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 155 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #144 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byJames Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Judith Sadler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Post, Russell) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 18, 2017 Filing 154 Statement of Non-Opposition re #144 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byAT&T Inc.. (Related document(s) #144 ) (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
July 18, 2017 Filing 153 Joinder re #144 MOTION to Transfer Case by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Advertising & Publishing LLC, YP Holdings, LLC, YP LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Horton As Counsel for Defendants AT&T Corp.; AT&T Services, Inc.; YP Holdings LLC; YP Advertising & Publishing LLC; YP LLC; and Specially Appearing Defendant AT&T INC. (Horton, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 29, 2017 Reset Deadlines as to #144 MOTION to Transfer Case . Responses due by 7/20/2017. Replies due by 8/3/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #148 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER RE STAY. Motions terminated: #66 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. and #67 MOTION for Joinder to AT&T/YP Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/27/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Aaron Levinson As Counsel for Defendants AT&T Corp.; AT&T Services, Inc.; YP Holdings LLC; YP Advertising & Publishing LLC; YP LLC; And Specially Appearing Defendant AT&T Inc. (Levinson, Marc) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 148 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #144 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by James Krawczyk. (Post, Russell) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 147 Request for Judicial Notice re #144 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byJohn P. Vaclavek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Copy of the Missouri Bankruptcy Court's Stay Order, #2 Exhibit B: Copy of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by the Walker Plaintiffs in the Texas Bankruptcy Court)(Related document(s) #144 ) (Warfield, David) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 146 Declaration of David A. Warfield filed byJohn P. Vaclavek. (Warfield, David) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 145 Declaration of John P. Vaclavek in Support of #144 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byJohn P. Vaclavek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Photos of the Globe Building)(Related document(s) #144 ) (Warfield, David) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 144 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by John P. Vaclavek. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 7/5/2017. Replies due by 7/12/2017. (Warfield, David) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #141 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Warfield.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 12, 2017 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John P. Vaclavek re #141 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John P. Vaclavek, Chapter 11 Trustee for Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11463862.) (Warfield, David) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 12, 2017 Filing 141 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John P. Vaclavek, Chapter 11 Trustee for Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11463862.) filed by John P. Vaclavek. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Warfield, David) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
February 10, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP Notice of Entry of Order Granting Stay Motion in Bankruptcy Case (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 31, 2017 Filing 139 RESPONSE to Court's Request Re Settlement Discussions by James Krawczyk. (Jordan, Janie) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 27, 2017 Filing 138 RESPONSE to re #137 Terminate Hearings,, Settlement Conference, Judge Ryu's Minute Order by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.. (Sung, William) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Telephonic discussions held on 1/19/2017. The parties were encouraged to explore the possibility/feasibility of global settlement discussions, and were asked to report back to Judge Ryu. In light of the bankruptcy proceedings, the 1/30/2017 settlement conference is hereby vacated. FTR Time Not Recorded. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/19/2017)
January 16, 2017 Filing 136 EXHIBITS re #135 Notice (Other) Supplemental Exhibit D filed byJames Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #135 ) (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 1/16/2017)
January 13, 2017 Filing 135 NOTICE by James Krawczyk re #134 Notice (Other) of Order in Bankruptcy Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Post, Russell) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 134 NOTICE by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP Notice of Order in Bankruptcy Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Totten, Julie) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 133 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAT&T Advertising, LP, YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 132 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 1/6/2017) Modified on 1/9/2017 (farS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #129 Stipulation Establishing Pleading Deadlines Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Services, Inc., YP Shared Services, LP, AT&T Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, AT&T Corp. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/23/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 23, 2016 Filing 130 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byJames Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42)(Post, Russell) (Filed on 12/23/2016) Modified on 12/27/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2016 Filing 129 STIPULATION Establishing Pleading Deadlines Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER on #64 , #80 , #82 , #84 , #86 , #88 MOTIONS to Dismiss and Strike. Any amended complaint is due by 12/23/2016. The plaintiffs have until 2/8/2017 to complete jurisdictional discovery re AT&T Inc. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/9/2016. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 127 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 1, 2016, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Columbini, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Tape Number: ramblinrs@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #126 Transcript Order, #125 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2017. (Related documents(s) #126 , #125 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/01/2016 before Hon. Vince Chhabria by James Krawczyk, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Jordan, Janie) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 8, 2016 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Hon. Vince Chhabria by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Moniz, Leo) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 12/1/2016 re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), (4), & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by AT&T Inc., #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by AT&T Advertising, LP, #86 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by YP Holdings, LLC, #84 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by AT&T Services, Inc., #82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by YP Shared Services, LP. The Court takes the matter under submission after hearing oral argument. The Court will issue a written ruling. FTR Time 11:50- 12:32. Plaintiff Attorney Richard Mithoff, Russell Post and Alexandra Summer. Defendant Attorney Julie Totten, Leo Moniz and Nicholas Horton. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/1/2016) Modified on 12/8/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Re Questions for Hearing. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/30/2016. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 122 Request for Judicial Notice re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), (4), & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #86 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #84 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #114 Reply to Opposition/Response,, #112 Reply to Opposition/Response, #82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #111 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byAT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP, YP Western Directory LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #80 , #88 , #86 , #84 , #114 , #112 , #82 , #111 ) (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER ON HEARING. Absent further notice, the parties should be prepared to proceed with the 12/1/2016 hearing on motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/23/2016. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 120 Statement re #116 Order, Plaintiffs' Response to Court's Order Requesting Statement by James Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 119 Statement re #116 Order, Status Conference Statement Regarding Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Krawczyk. AT&T Inc. served on 11/3/2016, answer due 11/25/2016. AT&T, Inc. Delaware (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Krawczyk. AT&T, Inc. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REQUESTING STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENTS. Statements regarding relationship between stay motion in bankruptcy case and upcoming hearing on motions to dismiss to be filed by 3:00 p.m. on 11/22/2016. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/21/2016. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 17, 2016 Set Hearing: Motion Hearing re Conditional Certification set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Motion Hearing for Summary Judgment set for 8/31/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Motion Hearing for Decertification set for 11/16/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 115 Request for Judicial Notice re #114 Reply to Opposition/Response,, filed byAT&T Advertising, LP, YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Related document(s) #114 ) (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 114 REPLY (re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #86 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) ) filed byAT&T Advertising, LP, YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 113 Request for Judicial Notice re #112 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byAT&T Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Related document(s) #112 ) (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 112 REPLY (re #84 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) ) filed byAT&T Services, Inc.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 111 REPLY (re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), (4), & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) ) filed byAT&T Inc.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 110 REPLY (re #64 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike ) filed byAT&T Corp.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 109 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), (4), & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #86 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #84 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) ) filed byJames Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell S. Post in Support of Plaintiffs Omnibus Response in Opposition to New Defendants Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2), (4) & (6), #2 Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs Omnibus Response in Opposition to New Defendants Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Statement of Non-Opposition to Specially Appearing Defendant AT&T Inc.s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2),(4) & (6), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23)(Post, Russell) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 108 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Krawczyk. AT&T Inc. served on 11/1/2016, answer due 11/22/2016. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 107 Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP, YP Western Directory LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 106 Proposed Summons. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 105 Proposed Summons. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 104 Proposed Summons. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 103 Proposed Summons. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 102 Proposed Summons. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 101 Proposed Summons. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Please use event "proposed summons". This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #95 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by James Krawczyk, #97 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by James Krawczyk, #99 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by James Krawczyk, #96 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by James Krawczyk, #98 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by James Krawczyk, #100 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by James Krawczyk (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 100 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Krawczyk as to AT&T Inc.. Amended Summon (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 99 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Krawczyk as to YP Shared Services, LP. Amended Summon (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 98 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Krawczyk as to YP Holdings, LLC. Amended Summon (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 97 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Krawczyk as to YP Western Directory, Inc.. Amended Summon (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 96 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Krawczyk as to AT&T Services, Inc.. Amended Summon (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 95 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Krawczyk as to AT&T Inc.. Amended Summon (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 25, 2016 Filing 94 RESPONSE to #90 Order Requesting Response filed by James Krawczyk. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 10/25/2016) Modified on 10/26/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2016 Filing 93 RESPONSE (re #64 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike ) filed byJames Krawczyk. (Post, Russell) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #91 Stipulation re Case Management Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 18, 2016 Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 77 Case Management Conference - Further,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, Stipulation and Proposed Case Management Order filed by James Krawczyk. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE ON EFFET OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY DIRECTORY DISTRIBUTING ASSOCIATES, INC.. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/18/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Advertising, LP (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by AT&T Advertising, LP. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/4/2016. Replies due by 11/11/2016. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 87 Certificate of Interested Entities by YP Holdings, LLC (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by YP Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/4/2016. Replies due by 11/11/2016. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 85 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Services, Inc. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by AT&T Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/4/2016. Replies due by 11/11/2016. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by YP Shared Services, LP (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by YP Shared Services, LP. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/4/2016. Replies due by 11/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gail Murray in Support of YP LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f))(Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 81 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Inc. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), (4), & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by AT&T Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/4/2016. Replies due by 11/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas M. Koch in Support of Specially Appearing Defendant AT&T Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), (4), & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #2 Specially Appearing Defendant AT&T Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), (4), & (6) and Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f))(Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP of Effect on Remaining Defendants of Bankruptcy Filing by Defendant Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 78 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Defendant Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.. (Sung, William) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 11, 2016 Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/11/2016. Any forthcoming motions to dismiss due by 10/17/2016. Responses to MTDs due by 11/4/2016. Replies to MTDs due by 11/11/2016. The hearing re motions to dismiss remains set for 12/1/2016. Discovery is now open. Initial disclosures due 11/1/2016. Parties to submit a stipulation and proposed order with responsive briefing and hearing dates for the conditional certification motion, cross-motions for summary judgment, and decertification motions, as outlined by the Court at the hearing. Total Time in Court 25 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney Richard Mithoff, Alexandra Summer, Russell Post. Defendant Attorney Marcus Lee for DDA; Julie Totten for AT&T Crop. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2016) Modified on 1/3/2017 (knm, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part #74 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond. Answer or response will be due 10/24/2016. Hearing on any motion to dismiss will be heard no later than 12/1/2016. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 75 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Response to First Amended Complaint filed by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie A. Totten ISO Motion of New Defendants to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Totten, Julie) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 29, 2016 Filing 73 STIPULATION re #56 Amended Complaint,,, to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1 filed by AT&T Advertising, LP, AT&T Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., YP Holdings, LLC, YP Shared Services, LP. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 29, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to #66 MOTION to Dismiss , #64 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike. Responses due by 10/24/2016. Replies due by 11/10/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #71 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for Defendant AT&T Corp.'s and Defendant DDS's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #67 MOTION for Joinder to AT&T/YP Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, #64 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike, #66 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Krawczyk. (Post, Russell) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order Granting Joint Request to Continue Settlement Conference and Rescheduling Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference rescheduled to 1/30/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Motions terminated: #69 Joint Motion to Continue Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/26/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 69 Joint MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference filed by AT&T Corp.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 20, 2016 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Krawczyk. AT&T Inc. served on 9/16/2016, answer due 10/7/2016. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 67 MOTION for Joinder to AT&T/YP Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.. (Sung, William) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/30/2016. Replies due by 10/7/2016. (Sung, William) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 65 Request for Judicial Notice re #64 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike filed byAT&T Corp.. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/30/2016. Replies due by 10/7/2016. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Krawczyk. YP Holdings, LLC served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Krawczyk. AT&T Advertising, LP served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Krawczyk. AT&T Inc. served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Krawczyk. AT&T Services, Inc. served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Krawczyk. YP Shared Services, LP served on 9/8/2016, answer due 9/29/2016. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Telephonic Further Case Management Conference held on 9/6/2016. Updated Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2016. The updated CMS should include a proposed schedule which contemplates a trial that does not delay the schedule as a way to see what happens in the other case as discussed. In-person Further Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. AT&T requests to vacated the SC due to the addition of parties; the Court does not grant or deny, but instead states that if the parties and Judge Ryu agree to move the settlement conference then the Court does not object.Total Time in Court 11 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney Richard Mithoff, Judith Sadler, Alexandra Summer, Russell Post. Defendant Attorney Bryan Kaemmerer and William Sung for DDA, Inc.; Julie Totten and Leo Moniz for AT&T. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/6/2016)
September 1, 2016 Filing 57 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Re Telephonic September 6, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Corp.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 30, 2016 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byJames Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit)(Post, Russell) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 30, 2016 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE TIME FOR THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONVERTING THE HEARING TO A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The matter is rescheduled to the following time due to one or more parties requesting to appear telephonically at the hearing. Defendant shall provide the Court and all other parties a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than three court days prior to the case management conference by way of email to the Court (vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov) with a cc to opposing counsel. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2016 02:30 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 19, 2016 Filing 54 Statement re #49 Notice (Other) Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-13(c) Opposing Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Related Case by AT&T Corp.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order Setting Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 10/11/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 10, 2016 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 9, 2016 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/9/2016. ***CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna Ryu for Settlement Conference to occur within 60 days. Plaintiff verbally moves to amend the complaint; GRANTED. Amended Complaint due by 8/30/2016. ***Motions terminated: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.Civ.R12 filed by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc., #30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by AT&T Corp. Discovery and exchange of initial disclosures are stayed and will be addressed at the next CMC. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco- parties should be prepared to set a trial management schedule at this hearing. If the parties wish to appear telephonically they may, but must follow Judge Chhabria's rule re requesting telephonic appearance as outlined in his Standing Order for Civil Cases. Total Time in Court 27 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney Richard Mithoff, Judith Sadler, Alexandra Summer, Russell Post, and Rachel Smith. Defendant Attorney Marcus Lee and Brian McGovern for DDA; Julie Totten and Leo Moniz for AT&T. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2016)
August 8, 2016 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. (Sung, William) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 8, 2016 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Krawczyk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jordan, Janie) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE by James Krawczyk of Pendency of Related Case (Smith, Rachel) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Kaemmerer.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- McGovern.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 4, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #45 Discovery Letter Brief. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus June Lee (Lee, Marcus) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 3, 2016 Filing 45 Letter Brief re #39 Order on Stipulation filed byAT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 8/3/2016) Modified on 8/4/2016 (knm, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2016 Filing 44 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 8/3/2016 with Tamara Lange. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 3, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Ranen (Ranen, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 2, 2016 Filing 42 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Corp.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-10647921) filed by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-10647852) filed by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McGovern, Brian) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 28, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.Civ.R12, #30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Responses due by 8/29/2016. Replies due by 9/22/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #34 Stipulation re Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule and Stay of Discovery.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 28, 2016 Filing 38 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on August 3, 2016 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 27, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 27, 2016 Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 27, 2016 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sung, William) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 26, 2016 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.Civ.R12 filed by AT&T Corp.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 25, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.Civ.R12 filed by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 8/8/2016. Replies due by 8/15/2016. (Sung, William) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 19, 2016 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jordan, Janie) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 18, 2016 Filing 31 Request for Judicial Notice re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byAT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #30 ) (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 18, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by AT&T Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 8/1/2016. Replies due by 8/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Totten, Julie) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 18, 2016 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Corp. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 18, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo Moniz As Counsel for Defendant AT&T Corp. (Moniz, Leo) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 13, 2016 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on July 6, 2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 5, 2016 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 5, 2016 Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AT&T Corp... (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 28, 2016 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant AT&T Corp. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/12/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 17, 2016 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Krawczyk for AT&T Corp (Smith, Rachel) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1 filed by AT&T Corp.. (Totten, Julie) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 9, 2016 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Krawczyk. Service waived by Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 6/7/2016, answer due 8/8/2016. (Smith, Rachel) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Krawczyk (Smith, Rachel) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD WARREN MITHOFF PRO HAC VICE, granting #15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/24/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JANIE L. JORDAN PRO HAC VICE, granting #14 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/24/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Krawczyk.. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10473730.) filed by James Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Jordan, Janie) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10473698.) filed by James Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Jordan, Janie) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CYNTHIA THOMSON DIGGS PRO HAC VICE, granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/13/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JUDITH BASTON SADLER PRO HAC VICE, granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/13/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RACHEL ADEL SMITH PRO HAC VICE, granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/13/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RUSSELL STANLEY POST PRO HAC VICE, granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/13/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10447909.) filed by James Krawczyk. (Diggs, Cynthia) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10447901.) filed by James Krawczyk. (Sadler, Judith) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10447856.) filed by James Krawczyk. (Smith, Rachel) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Russell S. Post ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10447784.) filed by James Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Post, Russell) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 12, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AT&T Corp., Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2016. Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2016 01:30 PM. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 11, 2016 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 5/25/2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 10, 2016 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 10, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Corp., Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10440150.). Filed byJames Krawczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, Part 1 of 72, #2 Exhibit 3, Part 2 of 72, #3 Exhibit 3, Part 3 of 72, #4 Exhibit 3, Part 4 of 72, #5 Exhibit 3, Part 5 of 72, #6 Exhibit 3, Part 6 of 72, #7 Exhibit 3, Part 7 of 72, #8 Exhibit 3, Part 8 of 72, #9 Exhibit 3, Part 9 of 72, #10 Exhibit 3, Part 10 of 72, #11 Exhibit 3, Part 11 of 72, #12 Exhibit 3, Part 12 of 72, #13 Exhibit 3, Part 13 of 72, #14 Exhibit 3, Part 14 of 72, #15 Exhibit 3, Part 15 of 72, #16 Exhibit 3, Part 16 of 72, #17 Exhibit 3, Part 17 of 72, #18 Exhibit 3, Part 18 of 72, #19 Exhibit 3, Part 19 of 72, #20 Exhibit 3, Part 20 of 72, #21 Exhibit 3, Part 21 of 72, #22 Exhibit 3, Part 22 of 72, #23 Exhibit 3, Part 23 of 72, #24 Exhibit 3, Part 24 of 72, #25 Exhibit 3, Part 25 of 72, #26 Exhibit 3, Part 26 of 72, #27 Exhibit 3, Part 27 of 72, #28 Exhibit 3, Part 28 of 72, #29 Exhibit 3, Part 29 of 72, #30 Exhibit 3, Part 30 of 72, #31 Exhibit 3, Part 31 of 72, #32 Exhibit 3, Part 32 of 72, #33 Exhibit 3, Part 33 of 72, #34 Exhibit 3, Part 34 of 72, #35 Exhibit 3, Part 35 of 72, #36 Exhibit 3, Part 36 of 72, #37 Exhibit 3, Part 37 of 72, #38 Exhibit 3, Part 38 of 72, #39 Exhibit 3, Part 39 of 72, #40 Exhibit 3, Part 40 of 72, #41 Exhibit 3, Part 41 of 72, #42 Exhibit 3, Part 42 of 72, #43 Exhibit 3, Part 43 of 72, #44 Exhibit 3, Part 44of 72, #45 Exhibit 3, Part 45 of 72, #46 Exhibit 3, Part 46 of 72, #47 Exhibit 3, Part 47 of 72, #48 Exhibit 3, Part 48 of 72, #49 Exhibit 3, Part 49 of 72, #50 Exhibit 3, Part 50 of 72, #51 Exhibit 3, Part 51 of 72, #52 Exhibit 3, Part 52 of 72, #53 Exhibit 3, Part 53 of 72, #54 Exhibit 3, Part 54 of 72, #55 Exhibit 3, Part 55 of 72, #56 Exhibit 3, Part 56 of 72, #57 Exhibit 3, Part 57 of 72, #58 Exhibit 3, Part 58 of 72, #59 Exhibit 3, Part 59 of 72, #60 Exhibit 3, Part 60 of 72, #61 Exhibit 3, Part 61 of 72, #62 Exhibit 3, Part 62 of 72, #63 Exhibit 3, Part 63 of 72, #64 Exhibit 3, Part 64 of 72, #65 Exhibit 3, Part 65 of 72, #66 Exhibit 3, Part 66 of 72, #67 Exhibit 3, Part 67 of 72, #68 Exhibit 3, Part 68 of 72, #69 Exhibit 3, Part 69 of 72, #70 Exhibit 3, Part 70 of 72, #71 Exhibit 3, Part 71 of 72, #72 Exhibit 3, Part 72 of 72, #73 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krawczyk v. Directory Distributing Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John P. Vaclavek
Represented By: David A. Warfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Advertising, LP
Represented By: Leo Moniz
Represented By: Nicholas James Horton
Represented By: Marc A. Levinson
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Leo Moniz
Represented By: Nicholas James Horton
Represented By: Marc A. Levinson
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YP Western Directory LLC
Represented By: Leo Moniz
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Leo Moniz
Represented By: Nicholas James Horton
Represented By: Marc A. Levinson
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YP Advertising & Publishing LLC
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Represented By: Nicholas James Horton
Represented By: Marc A. Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YP Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Leo Moniz
Represented By: Nicholas James Horton
Represented By: Marc A. Levinson
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Represented By: Leo Moniz
Represented By: Nicholas James Horton
Represented By: Marc A. Levinson
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YP Shared Services, LP
Represented By: Leo Moniz
Represented By: Nicholas James Horton
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directory Distributing Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ranen
Represented By: Bryan M. Kaemmerer
Represented By: Marcus June Lee
Represented By: William C Sung
Represented By: Brian E. McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YP LLC
Represented By: Julie A. Totten
Represented By: Nicholas James Horton
Represented By: Marc A. Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Krawczyk
Represented By: Richard W. Mithoff
Represented By: Alexandra P Summer
Represented By: Rachel Adel Smith
Represented By: Cynthia Thomson Diggs
Represented By: Janie L. Jordan
Represented By: Judith Sadler
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Russell S. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?