Woods v. The Circuit Attorney's Office of the City of St. Louis/The City of St. Louis, MO et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Woods
Defendant: Robert Steele, The Circuit Attorney's Office of the City of St. Louis/The City of St. Louis, MO, Michael Warrick, Eula Simmons and Kimberly Gardner
Case Number: 4:2019cv01401
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Referring Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen R Clark for all further proceedings. (District Judge Catherine D. Perry no longer assigned to case.) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/17/2019. (CBL)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings (KKS)
July 3, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Nancy Woods to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nancy Woods The Circuit Attorney's Office of the City of St. Louis/The City of St. Louis, MO waiver signed on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nancy Woods Kimberly Gardner waiver signed on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nancy Woods Robert Steele waiver signed on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nancy Woods Eula Simmons waiver signed on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nancy Woods Michael Warrick waiver signed on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 5. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Kimberly Gardner, Eula Simmons, Robert Steele, The Circuit Attorney's Office of the City of St. Louis/The City of St. Louis, MO, Michael Warrick with receipt number 0865-7228189, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Nancy Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service)(Petruska, Lynette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. The Circuit Attorney's Office of the City of St. Louis/The City of St. Louis, MO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Circuit Attorney's Office of the City of St. Louis/The City of St. Louis, MO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Warrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eula Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Woods
Represented By: Lynette M. Petruska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?