Connelly v. United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Thomas A. Connelly
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv01410
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/10/19. (JAB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Thomas A. Connelly. United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service served on 6/3/2019. (Devereux, Robert) Modified on 6/7/2019 (JMC).
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Thomas A. Connelly. (Devereux, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Correction of Answer due date as to SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (MRS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Thomas A. Connelly. United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Devereux, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Robert L. Devereux. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint,, Corrected Summons U.S. Attorney General by Plaintiff Thomas A. Connelly. (Devereux, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service with receipt number 0865-7230103, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Thomas A. Connelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Devereux, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/23/2019) (MFG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Internal Revenue Service, #8 Summons U.S. Attorney, #9 Summons MO Atty General) (MFG). Modified on 6/5/2019 (MFG). Exhibits A, B and D have been sealed due to personal identifiers in accordance to Local Rule 2.17

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connelly v. United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Connelly
Represented By: Robert L. Devereux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?