Vann v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Mary Vann
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01414
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mary Vann. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/17/2019, by serving U.S. Attorney, Jeffrey Jensen; answer due 8/16/2019. (MCB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Mary Vann. (CBL)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons were delivered to USMS via interoffice mail this date. (CBL)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (See Full Order.) This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days after their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed. R. Civ. P., Defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days after service of Plaintiff's complaint. Along with her answer Defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 5/29/2019. (CBL)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 5/29/2019. (CBL)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 23, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Mary Vann. (MFG)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mary Vann. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Mary Vann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Nancy Berryhill, #4 Summons William Barr, #5 Summons Jeffrey Jensen)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Vann
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?