Ray v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Ray
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01415
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Stipulation of Dismissal (ECF No. #18 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this cause of action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Dated this 8th day of July, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/8/19. (JAB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Plaintiff Michael Ray. (Mirfasihi, Mav)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Nelsen, Leo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PNR)(Nelsen, Leo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Nelsen, Leo)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Additional Time [ECF No. 10] is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/11/19. (ALM)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against defendant All Plaintiffs Jury demand, First, filed by Michael Ray.(Mirfasihi, Mav)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul B. Lee for Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Lee, Paul)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Nelsen, Leo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Nelsen, Leo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - St. Louis County Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal - File-Stamped St. Louis County, #3 Exhibit 3 - eFiling Receipt and Acceptance of Filing of Notice to Plaintiff and to State Court of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Acknowledgement by Clerk of Court of St. Louis County of Filing of Notice to Plaintiff and to State Court of Removal, #5 Exhibit 5 - eFiling Receipt and Acceptance of Filing of Amended Notice to Plaintiff and to State Court of Removal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Amended Notice to Plaintiff and to State Court of Removal, File-Stamped by St. Louis County Circuit Court)(Nelsen, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. Amended Sent To: State Court - Executed (Nelsen, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. Amended Sent To: Plaintiff (Nelsen, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to attorney Mav Mirfasihi from Clerk re: Admission PHV (BAK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Michael Ray.(BAK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. Parent companies: American Airlines Group, Inc., Subsidiaries: Non, Publicly held company: American Airlines Group, Inc.,. (Nelsen, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Unexecuted (Nelsen, Leo) Modified on 5/23/2019 (BAK).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Nelsen, Leo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, MO, case number 19SL-CC01399, with receipt number 0865-7230350, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Nelsen, Leo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Leo W. Nelsen, Jr.
Represented By: Paul B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray
Represented By: Mav Mirfasihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?