Gonzalez v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Shannon M. Gonzalez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01429
Filed: May 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/6/2019 through U.S. Attorney's Office, answer due 8/5/2019. (CSG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
May 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was mailed to USM St Louis. (MRS)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/29/19. (CSG)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issueon the complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/29/19. (CSG)
May 28, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Shannon M. Gonzalez. (BAK)
May 25, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shannon M. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA23 Financial)(Severs, Traci)
May 25, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Shannon M. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons William Barr, #4 Summons Nancy Berryhill, #5 Summons Jeffrey Jensen)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon M. Gonzalez
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?