Simpson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tyler Simpson
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01502
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (MCB)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Parent companies: MetLife, Inc., Subsidiaries: MTC Fund I, LLC; MTC Fund II, LLC; MTC Fund III, LLC; MetLife CC Member, LLC; MetLife 1201 TAB Member, LLC; MetLife LHH Member, LLC; MetLife Cabo Hilton Member, LLC; ML-AI MetLife Member 1, LLC; ML-AI MetLife Member 2, LLC; ML Southmore, LLC; MetLife Camino Ramon Member, LLC; Long Island Solar Farm, LLC; ML Mililani Member, LLC; MetLife 555 12th Member, LLC; MCPP Owners, LLC; Sino-US United MetLife Insurance Co., Ltd., Publicly held company: MetLife, Inc.,. (Buckley, Ann)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Buckley, Ann)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tyler Simpson Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver signed on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Shook, Jonathan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 29, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company with receipt number 0865-7236866, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Tyler Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service Notice and Request for Waiver)(Shook, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Simpson
Represented By: Jonathan Everett Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann E. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?