Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust et al v. Tefco Inc.
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust and Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust
Defendant: Tefco Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01531
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Tefco Inc... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Tefco Inc. [ECF No. #9 ] is GRANTED and the default of said defendant is hereby entered. (NEP)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant TEFCO, Inc. by Plaintiffs Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter in Response to Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Blumthal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Order)(Blumthal, William)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/5/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/12/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/24/2019. (NEP)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE RE: Summons Received June 5, 2019 by Defendant Tefco Inc. (NEP)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust. Tefco Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Blumthal, William)
June 1, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney William Blumthal. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Krol for Plaintiffs Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan. (Krol, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E. Mallon for Plaintiffs Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan. (Mallon, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by William Michael Blumthal, Jr for Plaintiffs Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan. (Blumthal, William)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan Process Server: Judicial Attorney Services, Inc (JWD)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Tefco Inc. with receipt number 0865-7242302, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Participation Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Blumthal, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust et al v. Tefco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tefco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan
Represented By: William Michael Blumthal, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust
Represented By: William Michael Blumthal, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Trust
Represented By: William Michael Blumthal, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?