Grobe v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Cossetta A. Grobe
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv01547
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Golterman, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Golterman for Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Golterman, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Cossetta A. Grobe to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/9/2019. (CBL)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cossetta A. Grobe Unum Life Insurance Company of America waiver signed on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Hicks, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Aubuchon, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (JWD)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Cossetta A. Grobe Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Cossetta A. Grobe. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Waiver of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grobe v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cossetta A. Grobe
Represented By: David M. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?