Brown v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Todd Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01564
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney filed by Jeffrey Todd Brown. (KCB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jeffrey Todd Brown. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/17/2019 by serving the U.S. Attorney, Jeffery Jensen; answer due 8/16/2019. (MCB)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Jeffrey Todd Brown. (BRP)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (AFC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Aubuchon, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 6/5/2019. (AFC)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 6/5/2019. (AFC)
June 4, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Jeffrey Todd Brown. (MFG)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffrey Todd Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23 Financial)(Severs, Traci)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Jeffrey Todd Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons William Barr, #4 Summons Nancy Berryhill, #5 Summons Jeffrey Jensen)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Todd Brown
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?