Hunter v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Connie Hunter
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01634
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Connie Hunter. . (Dunken, Bert)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - See Order For Details Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/2/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 07/02/2019. (AAS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Lubben, Cicely)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Lubben, Cicely)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Cicely I. Lubben for Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Lubben, Cicely)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ethicon, Inc..(Lubben, Cicely)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Ethicon, Inc.. Parent companies: Johnson & Johnson, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Johnson & Johnson,. (Lubben, Cicely)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Cicely I. Lubben for Defendant Ethicon, Inc.. (Lubben, Cicely)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Connie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Holland, Eric)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Connie Hunter. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Holland, Eric)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Connie Hunter. Ethicon, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Holland, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr.'s Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 3) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/17/19. (THL)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Terry Dunken. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7279671) by Plaintiff Connie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dunken, Bert)
June 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Eric D. Holland. (MFG)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiff Connie Hunter re #1 Complaint, (Holland, Eric)
June 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7259131, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Connie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Ethicon Inc, #4 Summons Johnson and Johnson)(Holland, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Cicely I. Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Cicely I. Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Hunter
Represented By: Eric D. Holland
Represented By: Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?