Graham v. Mentor Worldwide LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diane Graham
Defendant: Mentor Worldwide LLC, St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc. and Amy Haley
Case Number: 4:2019cv01637
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Referring Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Mentor Worldwide LLC.(Lubben, Cicely)
July 19, 2019 ***REMARK Certified copied of Order #28 and #29 mailed to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of Missouri. (AAS)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF REMAND - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Count III of this matter against Defendant Hale is hereby SEVERED and REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of Missouri.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/19/2019. (AAS)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Remand (ECF No. #12 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; that Plaintiffs Count III for Negligence against Defendant Hale is hereby severed and REMANDED to the Circuit Court for St. Louis County, an Order of Remand will be issued to accompany this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Count II for Strict Products Liability against Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc., is hereby DISMISSED; and that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Petition by Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc., (ECF No. #10 ) is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Mentor World Wide LLCs Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Petition is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/19/2019. (AAS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert D. Rowland for Defendant Amy Haley. (Rowland, Robert)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Lubben, Cicely)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to this Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition filed by Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.. (Callahan, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court Of St. Louis County, Missouri filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Lubben, Cicely)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Against Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(B)(6) Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition For Failure To State A Claim by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James) filed by Diane Graham, #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery Center, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Count II Of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition For Failure To State A Claim by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James) filed by Diane Graham ; DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/13/19. (CLA)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dustin B. Rawlin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7274190) by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Certificate of Good Standing)(Rawlin, Dustin) filed by Mentor Worldwide LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/13/19. (CLA)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(B)(6) Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition For Failure To State A Claim by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lubben, Cicely)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Case : Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Lubben, Cicely)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings (AFC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dustin B. Rawlin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7274190) by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certificate of Good Standing)(Rawlin, Dustin)
June 12, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Diane Graham, Defendants Amy Haley, Mentor Worldwide LLC, St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (AFC)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery Center, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Count II Of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition For Failure To State A Claim by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Lubben, Cicely)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court Of St. Louis County, Missouri by Plaintiff Diane Graham. (Krupp, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition filed by Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Callahan, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Callahan, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph F. Callahan for Defendant St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.. (Callahan, Joseph)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 5, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Amy Haley.(JWD)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Diane Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(JWD)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Diane Graham.(JWD)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC.. (Lubben, Cicely)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Lubben, Cicely)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial Circuit, St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC01441, with receipt number AMOEDC-7259377, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Mentor Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lubben, Cicely)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Mentor Worldwide LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Caroline M. Tinsley
Represented By: Cicely I. Lubben
Represented By: Dustin B. Rawlin, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Cosmetic Surgery, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph F. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Haley
Represented By: Robert D. Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Graham
Represented By: James P. Krupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?