Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Pernikoff Construction Company
Plaintiff: Lou Grasse, Steve MacDonald, Joe Hoette, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Mark Murphy, John Smith, Jr., Richard McLaughlin, Joe Scarfino, David Gillick, Ronny Griffin, Terry Briggs, Phil Hocher, Michael Luth, Brandon Flinn, Donald Willey, Patrick Pryor, Doug Wachsnicht, St. Louis Vacation Fund - Vacation Plan, Brad Grant, Michael Lutz, Matt Andrews, Gary Elliott, Richard McGuire, AGC - Eastern Missouri Laborers Joint Training Fund, Corey Black, Perri Pryor, Joseph Leritz, Robert Bieg, Jr., Jeffrey O'Connell, Frank Marchesi, William L. Luth, Cliff Land, Rich Mclaughlin, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis and Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund
Defendant: Pernikoff Construction Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01666
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without prejudice. (Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2019.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 7/19/19. (KJS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Patrick Pryor, AGC - Eastern Missouri Laborers Joint Training Fund, Lou Grasse, Donald Willey, David Gillick(Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis), Ronny Griffin, Brandon Flinn, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Richard McLaughlin, John Smith, Jr, St. Louis Vacation Fund - Vacation Plan, William L. Luth, Gary Elliott, Michael Luth, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Joe Hoette, Brad Grant, Mark Murphy, Perri Pryor, Michael Lutz, Cliff Land, Joseph Leritz, Doug Wachsnicht, Robert Bieg, Jr., Rich Mclaughlin, Phil Hocher, Matt Andrews, David Gillick, Joe Scarfino, Corey Black, Jeffrey O'Connell, Terry Briggs, Steve MacDonald, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Richard McGuire, Frank Marchesi. Pernikoff Construction Company served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Martin, Janine)
June 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Janine Martin. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JWD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AGC - Eastern Missouri Laborers Joint Training Fund, Matt Andrews, Robert Bieg, Jr., Corey Black, Terry Briggs, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Gary Elliott, Gary Elliott, Gary Elliott, Gary Elliott, Brandon Flinn, Brandon Flinn, Brandon Flinn, Brandon Flinn, David Gillick, David Gillick, Brad Grant, Lou Grasse, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Ronny Griffin, Phil Hocher, Joe Hoette, Cliff Land, Joseph Leritz, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Michael Luth, William L. Luth, Michael Lutz, Steve MacDonald, Frank Marchesi, Richard McGuire, Richard McLaughlin, Richard McLaughlin, Mark Murphy, Jeffrey O'Connell, Patrick Pryor, Perri Pryor, Joe Scarfino, John Smith, Jr, St. Louis Vacation Fund - Vacation Plan, Doug Wachsnicht, Donald Willey, Donald Willey, Donald Willey, Donald Willey Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc. (Martin, Janine)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Pernikoff Construction Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7269441, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Patrick Pryor, AGC - Eastern Missouri Laborers Joint Training Fund, Lou Grasse, Donald Willey, David Gillick(Trustees of the Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis), Ronny Griffin, Brandon Flinn, Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Richard McLaughlin, John Smith, Jr, St. Louis Vacation Fund - Vacation Plan, William L. Luth, Gary Elliott, Michael Luth, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Joe Hoette, Brad Grant, Mark Murphy, Perri Pryor, Michael Lutz, Cliff Land, Joseph Leritz, Doug Wachsnicht, Robert Bieg, Jr., Phil Hocher, Matt Andrews, David Gillick, Joe Scarfino, Corey Black, Jeffrey O'Connell, Terry Briggs, Steve MacDonald, Local Union Nos. 42-110, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Richard McGuire, Frank Marchesi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Martin, Janine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. Pernikoff Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Grasse
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve MacDonald
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hoette
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union Nos. 42-110, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Murphy
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McLaughlin
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Scarfino
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gillick
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny Griffin
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Briggs
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Hocher
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Luth
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Flinn
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Willey
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Pryor
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Wachsnicht
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Vacation Fund - Vacation Plan
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Grant
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lutz
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Andrews
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Elliott
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McGuire
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGC - Eastern Missouri Laborers Joint Training Fund
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Black
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perri Pryor
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Leritz
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bieg, Jr.
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey O'Connell
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Marchesi
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Luth
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Land
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Mclaughlin
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pernikoff Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?