Davis v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Sonja Davis
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01680
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint(ECF No. [6)] is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs is granted until Friday, August 16, 2019,within which to file an Amended Complaint, in compliance with the foregoing. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 8/16/2019.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 08/01/2019. (AAS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Sonja Davis. (Sandroni, Andrew)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 First MOTION for Leave to file out of time up to and including July 12, 2019, by Plaintiff Sonja Davis. (Sandroni, Andrew) filed by Sonja Davis ; LEAVE GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/10/2019. (AAS) Modified on 7/11/2019 (KXS).
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Leave to file out of time by Plaintiff Sonja Davis. (Sandroni, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rumsin A. Khoshaba. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7297468) by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Khoshaba, Rumsin) filed by The Boeing Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/25/19. (KJS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rumsin A. Khoshaba. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7297468) by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Khoshaba, Rumsin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregg M. Lemley for Defendant The Boeing Company. (Lemley, Gregg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew L. Metcalf for Defendant The Boeing Company. (Metcalf, Andrew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas F. Hurka for Defendant The Boeing Company. (Hurka, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Boeing Company.. (Shechter, Gabriel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge)(Shechter, Gabriel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Shechter, Gabriel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant The Boeing Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Circuit Court of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Shechter, Gabriel)
June 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JWD)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to attorney Andrew Sandroni from Deputy Clerk Re:admission to the Eastern District of Missouri (JWD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Sonja Davis. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter)(JWD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant The Boeing Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Notice of Removal)(Shechter, Gabriel)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC01789, with receipt number AMOEDC-7271702, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Marilyn Fredette, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Circuit Court of St. Louis County, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shechter, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Gabriel Shechter
Represented By: Andrew L. Metcalf
Represented By: Rumsin Khoshaba
Represented By: Gregg M. Lemley
Represented By: Thomas F. Hurka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Davis
Represented By: Andrew D. Sandroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?