Tinsley v. Clean-Tech Company et al
Plaintiff: Jack Tinsley
Defendant: Express Scripts and Clean-Tech Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01695
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 16. Mon Jul 15 14:32:01 CDT 2019 (Shepard, Alicia)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET TEXT ORDER re #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Clean-Tech Company, Express Scripts; GRANTED., Terminate Case. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/15/2019. (AAS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Clean-Tech Company, Express Scripts Plaintiff has given permission for Defendants' to File on his Behalf (Westbrook, Jamie)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 14. Wed Jul 3 10:11:28 CDT 2019 (Shirley, Kelley)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Defendants Clean-Tech Company, Express Scripts. (Westbrook, Jamie) filed by Clean-Tech Company, Express Scripts ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 7/3/19. (KJS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Defendants Clean-Tech Company, Express Scripts. (Westbrook, Jamie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Jack Tinsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KJS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Express Scripts. (Westbrook, Jamie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Express Scripts. (Westbrook, Jamie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Clean-Tech Company. (Westbrook, Jamie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Clean-Tech Company. (Westbrook, Jamie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Express Scripts. Parent companies: Express Scripts Holding Company, Subsidiaries: ESI Partnership; Express Scripts Pharmaceutical Procurement LLC; InsideRX LLC; Piso Delmatico LLC; and Sure Scripts RX Hub LLC, Publicly held company: Cigna Corporation,. (Franklin, Corey)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Clean-Tech Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Not Applicable,. (Franklin, Corey)
June 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Jack Tinsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BAK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jamie M. Westbrook for Defendants Clean-Tech Company, Express Scripts. (Westbrook, Jamie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Clean-Tech Company, Express Scripts Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court Clerk of Removal)(Franklin, Corey)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Corey L. Franklin for Defendants Clean-Tech Company, Express Scripts. (Franklin, Corey)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CIRCUIT COURT FOR THE CITY OF ST. LOUIS, case number 1922-CC00930, with receipt number AMOEDC-7277066, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Clean-Tech Company, Express Scripts. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exh. A - State Court File, #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Civil Cover Sheet )(Franklin, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tinsley v. Clean-Tech Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts
Represented By: Corey L. Franklin
Represented By: Jamie M. Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean-Tech Company
Represented By: Corey L. Franklin
Represented By: Jamie M. Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?