Mungenast Investments, LLC v. Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mungenast Investments, LLC
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01697
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen William Carman for Plaintiff Mungenast Investments, LLC, Counter Defendant Mungenast Investments, LLC. (Carman, Stephen)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron D. French for Plaintiff Mungenast Investments, LLC, Counter Defendant Mungenast Investments, LLC. (French, Aaron)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Mungenast Investments, LLC by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Launch Assistance Letter, #2 Exhibit B - May 9, 2019 Letter)(Bledsoe, Stephen)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Bledsoe, Stephen) filed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/17/19. (CSG)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Bledsoe, Stephen)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's State Court Petition by Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Bledsoe, Stephen) filed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/3/19. (CSG)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's State Court Petition by Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Bledsoe, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Rodney W. Sippel no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings. (KXS)
June 14, 2019 ***REMARK: On 6/14/2019 Pltff's counsel filed a Motion for TRO. Counsel subsequently filed a Memorandum to the Court indicating that plaintiff does not intend to notice its Motion for TRO for a hearing at this time. If circumstances warrant it, Plaintiff reserves its right to notice its motion for hearing in the future. Per the Court's direction, the Motion for TRO is hereby terminated as a pending motion. (LMY)
June 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM TO THE COURT re: TRO Hearing by Plaintiff Mungenast Investments, LLC. (O'Leary, Timothy) Modified on 6/14/2019 (MRC).
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Mungenast Investments, LLC. (BAK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Mungenast Investments, LLC.(BAK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Bledsoe, Stephen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. Parent companies: Mitsubishi Motors Corporation of Japan, Subsidiaries: None not wholly owned, Publicly held company: No,. (Bledsoe, Stephen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC02325, with receipt number AMOEDC-7277415, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bledsoe, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mungenast Investments, LLC v. Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mungenast Investments, LLC
Represented By: Stephen William Carman
Represented By: Aaron D. French
Represented By: Timothy J. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?