Grady v. Gaddy et al
Plaintiff: Michael Grady
Defendant: James Gaddy, Dean Hoag and Michael Reilly
Case Number: 4:2019cv01701
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION to Incorporate the Attachments Hereto as Exhibits by Plaintiff Michael Grady. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(TMT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Michael Grady. (KCB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Michael Grady. (KCB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Michael Grady. (BRP)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 14, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jun 14 14:01:21 CDT 2019 (admin,)
June 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (DLB)
June 14, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Michael Grady. (DLB)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Michael Grady. (DLB)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant James Gaddy, Dean Hoag, Michael Reilly Jury Demand,, filed by Michael Grady. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope, #4 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady v. Gaddy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Hoag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?