King v. I.C. System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jarrel King
Defendant: I.C. System, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01703
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Referring Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply: 1. Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, is set for Thursday, September 12, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in the chambers of Judge Stephen R. Clark. Lead trial counsel must appear for the conference in-person. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/30/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/12/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/6/19. (JAB)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER (GJL). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (KXS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by I.C. System, Inc..(Watts, Patrick)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick A. Watts for Defendant I.C. System, Inc.. (Watts, Patrick)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant I.C. System, Inc.. Parent companies: None., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: None.,. (Watts, Patrick)
June 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Jarrel King.(MFG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant I.C. SYSTEM, INC. Sent To: Plaintiff (Watts, Patrick)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 1922-AC06180, with receipt number AMOEDC-7279645, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by I.C. SYSTEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Watts, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. I.C. System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrel King
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C. System, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?