Ford v. Pine Lawn Food Market, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nakisha Ford
Defendant: Pine Lawn Food Market, Inc., Sylvester Caldwell, Mazen "Mario" Samad, Steven Blakeney, Akram "Sam" Samad and Pine Lawn City of
Case Number: 4:2019cv01708
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (Schriener, Kevin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (Schriener, Kevin)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (CLO) filed by Steven Blakeney ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 7/26/2019.)No further extensions for this deadline. Counsel is reminded to file any motion for extension prior to the deadline. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/22/2019. (CLO)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (CLO)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading One-Day Out of Time by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Motion for Extension of Time)(Schriener, Kevin) filed by Steven Blakeney ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/22/2019. (CLO)
July 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading One-Day Out of Time by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Motion for Extension of Time)(Schriener, Kevin)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court.. The order will not be added to the website. Signed by Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 07/11/2019. (AAS) (Main Document 18 replaced on 7/15/2019) (LMY).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: as to Steven Blakeney Re: #16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (Schriener, Kevin) filed by Steven Blakeney ; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JULY 19, 2019, (Steven Blakeney answer due 7/19/2019.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/8/19. (KJS)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (Schriener, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Nakisha Ford. (Tate, Rufus) filed by Nakisha Ford ; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING UP TO AND INCLUDING JULY 12, 2019. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/1/19. (KJS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Nakisha Ford. (Tate, Rufus)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Pine Lawn Food Market, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment) by Defendant Pine Lawn Food Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Maloney, James)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (Schriener, Kevin) filed by Steven Blakeney ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 06/24/2019. (AAS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Pine Lawn City of. (Hill, Blake)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Pine Lawn City of. (Hill, Blake)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Steven Blakeney. (Schriener, Kevin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L. Belancio for Defendants Pine Lawn Food Market, Inc., Akram "Sam" Samad, Mazen "Mario" Samad. (Belancio, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by James P. Maloney for Defendants Pine Lawn Food Market, Inc., Akram "Sam" Samad, Mazen "Mario" Samad. (Maloney, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Pine Lawn Food Market, Inc., Akram "Sam" Samad, Mazen "Mario" Samad. (Maloney, James)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Pine Lawn City of Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hill, Blake)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Pine Lawn City of Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hill, Blake)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Nakisha Ford.(BAK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Pine Lawn City of Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)(Hill, Blake)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 18SL-CC01453, with receipt number AMOEDC-7280315, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Pine Lawn City of. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit I - State Court File, #4 Exhibit II - Blakeney Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit III - Mario Samad, Sam Samad and Pine Lawn Market Consent to Removal)(Hill, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Pine Lawn Food Market, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Lawn Food Market, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Belancio
Represented By: James P. Maloney
Represented By: Kyle Nathan Roehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazen "Mario" Samad
Represented By: Michael L. Belancio
Represented By: James P. Maloney
Represented By: Kyle Nathan Roehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Blakeney
Represented By: Kevin L. Schriener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akram "Sam" Samad
Represented By: Michael L. Belancio
Represented By: James P. Maloney
Represented By: Kyle Nathan Roehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Lawn City of
Represented By: Blake Daniel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakisha Ford
Represented By: Rufus J. Tate, Jr.
Represented By: Celestine Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?