Green v. City of St Louis et al
Plaintiff: Milton Green
Defendant: City of St Louis and Christopher Tanner
Case Number: 4:2019cv01711
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: as to City of St Louis, Christopher Tanner Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants City of St Louis, Christopher Tanner. (Dulle, J.) ; ORDERED GRANTED, City of St Louis answer due 8/26/2019; Christopher Tanner answer due 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/15/19. (JAB)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants City of St Louis, Christopher Tanner. (Dulle, J.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants City of St Louis, Christopher Tanner, Plaintiff Milton Green. (KKS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by J. Brent Dulle for Defendants City of St Louis, Christopher Tanner. (Dulle, J.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Milton Green Christopher Tanner waiver signed on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Drake, Kiara)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Milton Green City of St Louis waiver signed on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Drake, Kiara)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kiara Nayo Drake for Plaintiff Milton Green. (Drake, Kiara) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/11/2019 to correct the case number on document) (KKS).
July 8, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Milton Green to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by James R. Wyrsch for Plaintiff Milton Green. (Wyrsch, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Lawsuit and Waiver of Summons: by Plaintiff Milton Green (Wyrsch, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 17, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 2. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Milton Green. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (MFG)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7281803, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Milton Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Self Insurance Letter)(Khazaeli, Javad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Lawsuit, #5 Waiver of Service City of St. louis, #6 Tanner Notice of Lawsuit, #7 Waiver of Service Tanner) (MFG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. City of St Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St Louis
Represented By: J. Brent Dulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Tanner
Represented By: J. Brent Dulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Green
Represented By: Javad M. Khazaeli
Represented By: James R. Wyrsch
Represented By: Kiara Nayo Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?