NRRM, LLC v. Auto Advantage Inc.
Plaintiff: NRRM, LLC
Defendant: Auto Advantage Inc and Auto Advantage Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01713
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff NRRM, LLC, shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration.Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal without prejudice.Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 7/25/19. (ARL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by NRRM, LLC. Auto Advantage Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Kass, Jeffrey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff NRRM, LLC Process Server: Wheels of Justice (MFG)
June 19, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Jeffrey H. Kass. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Original Filing Form, filed by Plaintiff NRRM, LLC. (Kass, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff NRRM, LLC.. (Kass, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Notice of Intent to Use Process Server and Summons to be Issued, filed by Plaintiff NRRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be Issued)(Kass, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For False Advertising and Unfair Competition against defendant Auto Advantage Inc with receipt number AMOEDC-7283217, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by NRRM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Kass, Jeffrey) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/19/2019) (MFG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NRRM, LLC v. Auto Advantage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Advantage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Advantage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRRM, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?