United States of America v. Four Thousand, One Hundred Dollars and No Cents in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $31,261.00 U.S. Currency, $4,100.00 U.S. Currency, Four Thousand, One Hundred Dollars and No Cents in U.S. Currency and Thirty-One Thousand, Two Hundred and Sixty-One Dollars and No Cents in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Demond McDaniels
Case Number: 4:2019cv01724
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Charles A Shaw
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (Bateman, Kyle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MARSHAL Return Executed Party served: Demond McDaniels, Type of return: Complaint & Notice, (MRC)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFIED CLAIM and ANSWER To Verified Complaint of Forfeiture re Complaint, #1 filed by Claimant Demond McDaniels. (Attachments: #1 Mailing envelope) (MRC) [Docket text modified to expand the title of document. Modified on 7/26/2019 (MRC).]
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed party served: Ferdinand McGuire, Type of return: Complaint & Notice, (MRC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed party served: Patrick Conroy, Type of return: Complaint & Notice, (MRC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed upon $4,100.00 U.S. Currency Type of return: Complaint & Warrant, (MRC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed upon $31,261.00 U.S, Currency Type of return: Complaint & Warrant, (MRC)
June 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Charles A. Shaw. (MFG)
June 20, 2019 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendantThirty-One Thousand, Two Hundred and Sixty-One Dollars and No Cents in U.S. Currency. (MFG)
June 20, 2019 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendantFour Thousand, One Hundred Dollars and No Cents in U.S. Currency. (MFG)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant For $4,100.00 U.S. Currency, #4 Warrant For $31,261.00 U.S. Currency)(Bateman, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Four Thousand, One Hundred Dollars and No Cents in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $31,261.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,100.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Thousand, One Hundred Dollars and No Cents in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirty-One Thousand, Two Hundred and Sixty-One Dollars and No Cents in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Timothy Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Demond McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?