Bush v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Cecilia L Bush
Defendant: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc., GE Appliances and General Electric Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01726
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/21/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/27/2019 02:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/25/2019. (CLO)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court.. The order will not be added to the website. Signed by Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 07/11/2019. (AAS) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/15/2019) (LMY).
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by GE Appliances, General Electric Company, Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc..(Sharkey, Andreea)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants GE Appliances, General Electric Company, Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. Parent companies: Haier US Appliance Holdings, Inc. and Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Sharkey, Andreea)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants GE Appliances, General Electric Company, Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: GE Capital Australia Funding, Pty. LTD., GE Capital Canada Funding Company, GE Capital European Funding., GE Capital Franchise Finance Corporation, GE Capital International Funding Company, GE Capital International Funding Company, GE Capital Treasury Services LLC, GE Capital UK Funding, Security Capital Group, Inc. General Electric Capital Corporation, Publicly held company: None,. (Sharkey, Andreea)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Andreea T. Sharkey. (Sharkey, Andreea)
June 20, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Court Docket Sheet. (BAK)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Cecilia L Bush.(BAK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants GE Appliances, General Electric Company, Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Sharkey, Andreea)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC01593, with receipt number AMOEDC-7289195, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by GE Appliances, Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc., General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sharkey, Andreea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Andreea T. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Appliances
Represented By: Andreea T. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Andreea T. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia L Bush
Represented By: Brian M. Wendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?