Garland v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Theresa M. Garland
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01765
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Theresa M. Garland, Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (KEK)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 (DOCUMENT DELETED DUE TO ATTORNEY FILING ERROR) CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation.. (Halberg, Caleb) Modified on 8/16/2019 (JAB).
August 15, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Theresa M. Garland, Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/16/2019. (NEP)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Theresa M. Garland. . (Stoddard, Mitchell)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Stay is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's deadline for responding to the motion to dismiss shall be stayed until further order of this Court. An appropriate schedule, including a deadline for the response to the motion to dismiss, will be determined at the Rule 16 conference to be held on August 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 8/12/19. (ARL)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay re #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Plaintiff Theresa M. Garland. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Halberg, Caleb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Halberg, Caleb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Halberg, Caleb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County filed by Plaintiff Theresa M. Garland. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County by Plaintiff Theresa M. Garland. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Extension for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Petition (Unopposed) by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Halberg, Caleb) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 6/25/19. (KEK)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/13/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/20/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 6/25/19. (ARL)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Petition (Unopposed) by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Halberg, Caleb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation.. (Halberg, Caleb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Halberg, Caleb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Caleb J. Halberg for Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Halberg, Caleb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Court Docket Sheet. (BAK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Theresa M. Garland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(BAK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (BAK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC01598, with receipt number AMOEDC-7292121, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons and Petition), #2 Exhibit B (Appraisal), #3 Exhibit C (State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Halberg, Caleb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garland v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa M. Garland
Represented By: Mitchell B. Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?