Goldsmith v. Lee Enterprises Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Steven Goldsmith
Defendant: Lee Enterprises Missouri, Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC and Lee Enterprises Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01772
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lee Enterprises Inc., Lee Enterprises Missouri, Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Martineau, Joseph)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lee Enterprises Inc., Lee Enterprises Missouri, Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Martineau, Joseph) Modified on 8/14/2019 (KJS).
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Steven Goldsmith. (Cornfeld, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Steven Goldsmith. (Cornfeld, Richard)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 Defendants' ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint,, by Lee Enterprises Inc., Lee Enterprises Missouri, Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC.(Martineau, Joseph)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Lee Enterprises Inc., Lee Enterprises Missouri, Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC Jury Demand demand, , filed by Steven Goldsmith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Records of Plaintiffs bills, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - DMA Guidelines for Ethical Business Practice January 2014, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - DMA Do the Right Thing A Companion to DMA's Guidelines for Ethical Business Practice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - The American Marketing Association Statement of Ethics)(Cornfeld, Richard)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Lee Enterprises Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Hessel, John)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Roger R. Myers filed by Lee Enterprises Missouri, Inc., Lee Enterprises Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC, Pulitzer, Inc. ; GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/28/19. (KJS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Lee Enterprises Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Hessel, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Roger R. Myers. Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7303330) by Defendants Lee Enterprises Inc., Lee Enterprises Missouri, Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Myers, Roger)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Lee Enterprises Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - E-mail Confirmation from State Court)(Martineau, Joseph)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E. Martineau for Defendants Lee Enterprises Inc., Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Martineau, Joseph)
June 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Steven Goldsmith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward T. Pivin for Defendants Lee Enterprises Incorporated, Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Pivin, Edward)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by John M. Hessel for Defendants Lee Enterprises Incorporated, Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Hessel, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Lee Enterprises Incorporated, Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Hessel, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Pulitzer, Inc.. Parent companies: Lee Enterprises, Incorporated, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Lee Enterprises, Incorporated,. (Hessel, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Hessel, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: INN Partners, L.C. d/b/a TownNews.com; Madison Newspapers, Inc.; Fairgrove LLC; STL Distribution Services LLC; TNI Partners; Community Distribution Partners, LLC; St. Louis Post-Dispatch, LLC, Publicly held company: None,. (Hessel, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by John M. Hessel for Defendants Lee Enterprises Incorporated, Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Hessel, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC001967, with receipt number AMOEDC-7293135, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated, Pulitzer, Inc., St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Hessel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsmith v. Lee Enterprises Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Enterprises Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Represented By: John M. Hessel
Represented By: Roger Myers
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulitzer, Inc.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Represented By: John M. Hessel
Represented By: Roger Myers
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Post-Dispatch LLC
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Represented By: John M. Hessel
Represented By: Roger Myers
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Represented By: John M. Hessel
Represented By: Roger Myers
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Goldsmith
Represented By: Daniel Scott Levy
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?