Hughes v. Spielberg et al
Plaintiff: William C. Hughes
Defendant: Industrial Light and Magic, Via Com, Sony, Paramount Pictures, George Lucas, Steven Spielberg, Columbia Pictures, Dreamworks and Amblin Entertainment
Case Number: 4:2019cv01780
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of USCA as to #7 Notice of Appeal filed by William C. Hughes USCA Appeal #: 19-2510 The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/16/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice.(AAS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Notification from USCA for #7 Notice of Appeal filed by William C. Hughes USCA Appeal Number: 19-2510(AAS)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #5 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), #4 Memorandum & Order,,. Notice of Appeal filed on 07/12/2019 by Plaintiff William C. Hughes. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(MFG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Memorandum & Order,, #5 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), by Plaintiff William C. Hughes. (AAS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff William C. Hughes. (KJS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4-5. Tue Jun 25 12:30:36 CDT 2019 (Shirley, Kelley)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered herewith, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/25/19. (KJS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #3] is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 6/25/19. (KJS)
June 24, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Jun 24 11:01:20 CDT 2019 (admin,)
June 24, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG)
June 24, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff William C. Hughes. (MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William C. Hughes. (MFG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by William C. Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Spielberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Light and Magic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Via Com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Spielberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Pictures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamworks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amblin Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?