The Matter of LB et al v. Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: IN RE: The Matter of LB, a Minor Child, LB and Kaeci Bell, The Matter of LB and Kaeci Bell
Defendant: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01782
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Kaeci Bell. (Leeds, Kenneth) ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 9/16/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/14/2019. (CLO)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Kaeci Bell. (Leeds, Kenneth)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Kaeci Bell, The Matter of LB. (Leeds, Kenneth) filed by The Matter of LB, Kaeci Bell ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 8/15/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/26/2019. (CLO)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Kaeci Bell, The Matter of LB. (Leeds, Kenneth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. (Perryman, Neal)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. (Perryman, Neal)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to be Appointed Next Friend of LB [ #9 ] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/26/19. (JAB)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiffs Complaint by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. (Perryman, Neal) filed by Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 7/24/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/26/2019. (CLO)
June 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to #9 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to L.B. ; relationship to minor:Mother by Plaintiff Kaeci Bell.. (MFG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to L.B. ; relationship to minor:Mother by Plaintiff Kaeci Bell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MFG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Kaeci Bell, The Matter of LB.(MFG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiffs Complaint by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. (Perryman, Neal)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by David W. Gearhart for Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. (Gearhart, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Perryman, Neal)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield Sent To: Plaintiff (Perryman, Neal)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L. Jente for Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. (Jente, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Neal F. Perryman for Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. (Perryman, Neal)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC02299, with receipt number AMOEDC-7295472, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Perryman, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Matter of LB et al v. Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IN RE: The Matter of LB, a Minor Child, LB and Kaeci Bell
Represented By: Kenneth A. Leeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Matter of LB
Represented By: Kenneth A. Leeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaeci Bell
Represented By: Kenneth A. Leeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Neal F. Perryman
Represented By: Michael L. Jente
Represented By: David W. Gearhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?