Tullock et al v. City of St. Louis
Plaintiff: Mark McLaughlin, Dennis Tullock and Bernard Crittenden
Defendant: City of St. Louis
Case Number: 4:2019cv01783
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiff must show cause no later than August 28, 2019, why these Counts should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). Show Cause Response due by 8/28/2019.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 08/22/2019. (AAS)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Case Counts II and IV filed by Plaintiffs Bernard Crittenden, Mark McLaughlin, Dennis Tullock. (Burger, Gary)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss Case Counts II and IV by Defendant City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Counts II and IV of Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Ekpo, Georganna)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of St. Louis.(Ekpo, Georganna)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: as to City of St. Louis Re: #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Defendant City of St. Louis. (Ekpo, Georganna) filed by City of St. Louis ; ORDERED GRANTED, City of St. Louis answer due 8/7/2019.Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/17/19. (ARL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Defendant City of St. Louis. (Ekpo, Georganna)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Georganna Ekpo for Defendant City of St. Louis. (Ekpo, Georganna)
June 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Gary K. Burger, Jr.. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Bernard Crittenden, Mark McLaughlin, Dennis Tullock of Intent to Use Process Server (Burger, Gary)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Plaintiffs Bernard Crittenden, Mark McLaughlin, Dennis Tullock. (Burger, Gary)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-7295918, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Dennis Tullock, Bernard Crittenden, Mark McLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Burger, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tullock et al v. City of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McLaughlin
Represented By: Gary K. Burger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tullock
Represented By: Gary K. Burger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Crittenden
Represented By: Gary K. Burger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Louis
Represented By: Georganna Ekpo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?