Via v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: JACK VIA
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America d/b/a Cigna Group Insurance and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2019cv01785
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Boyer, Jamie)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Boyer, Jamie) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/22/19. (CSG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Boyer, Jamie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by William E. Hanna for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jamie L. Boyer for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Boyer, Jamie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jack Via. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
June 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. The summons was emailed to Attorney for Plaintiff. (CSG)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jack Via. (CSG) filed by Jack Via ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/27/19. (CSG)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jack Via. (CSG)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL (civil cover sheet) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Jack Via. (CSG)
June 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Plaintiff has failed to file a Motion for In Forma Pauperis and a signed Civil Cover Sheet. (BAK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jack Via Process Server: Heaven Sent (BAK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff JACK VIA. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant JACK VIA Non-Jury Demand,, filed by JACK VIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Summons , #4 Attachment Disclosure of Organizational Interests, #5 Attachment Intent to use process server)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Via v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK VIA
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America d/b/a Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jamie L. Boyer
Represented By: William E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?