Williams, Sr. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Derrie S. Williams, Sr.
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01787
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to William Barr filed by Derrie S. Williams, Sr. (NEP)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Derrie S. Williams, Sr. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Andrew M. Saul served. (KEK)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Derrie S. Williams, Sr.. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (AAS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Andrew M. Saul, Plaintiff Derrie S. Williams, Sr. (KEK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KEK)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS} Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 6/25/19. (KEK)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 6/25/19. (KEK)
June 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Derrie S. Williams, Sr.. (Camp, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Derrie S. Williams, Sr.. (Camp, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Derrie S. Williams, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Camp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Sr. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrie S. Williams, Sr.
Represented By: David D. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?