United States of America v. $31,800.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $31,800.00 U.S. Currency
Case Number: 4:2019cv01865
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER: WHEREAS, all potential claimants have been given notice of this proceeding in accordance with the requirements of Supplemental Rule G of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the time for filing claims has expired; AND WHEREAS a settlement agreement has been reached between the United States and Claimant Leroy Jackson, who is the only claimant joined in this proceeding; AND WHEREAS, pursuant to that agreement, the parties have agreed to the entry of a final judgment and order of forfeiture as set forth below; [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS].. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 08/06/2019. (KCB)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served:Erica Mirabella, Esq. Type of return Complaint and Notice. Item mailed certified on 7/2/2019. Item delivered on 7/5/2019. (CBL)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served:Leroy Jackson. Type of return Complaint and Notice. Item mailed certified on 7/2/2019. Item delivered on 7/8/2019. (CBL)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed. Party served $31,800 US Currency, Type of return Complaint and Warrant. 2/28/2019 USMS Custody. 7/2/2019 Complaint and Warrant served on Asset. (CBL)
July 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)
July 2, 2019 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant $31,800.00 U.S. Currency. (BAK)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $31,800.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $31,800.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $31,800.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lindsay L. McClure-Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?