Hennessey v. Kohls Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jill Hennessey
Defendant: Kohls Corporation and Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01866
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by movant Scott Andrew Kitner, for the purpose of representing Plaintiff Jill Hennessey; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 08/27/2019. (RTS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott A. Kitner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7421340) by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kitner, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by movant Matthew J. Zevin, for the purpose of representing Plaintiff Jill Hennessey; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 08/22/2019. (RTS)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew J. Zevin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number BMOEDC-7413240) by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zevin, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 SECOND Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Jill Hennessey to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. ( Response to Court due by 9/4/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/2/19. (KKS)
August 2, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Jill Hennessey to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Munich, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by John R. Munich for Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.. (Munich, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Christopher O. Bauman. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey Process Server: Lousika Legal Courier, LLC (BAK)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7309236, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jill Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bauman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Summons) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hennessey v. Kohls Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Hennessey
Represented By: Christopher O. Bauman
Represented By: Matthew J. Zevin
Represented By: Scott Kitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls Corporation
Represented By: John R. Munich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls Departments Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Munich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?