Hennessey v. The Gap Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jill Hennessey
Defendant: Old Navy, Inc., The Gap Inc. and Old Navy, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01867
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott A. Kitner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7421377) by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/28/2019. (BRP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott A. Kitner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7421377) by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kitner, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew J. Zevin ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/22/19. (CDP)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew J. Zevin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7413267) by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zevin, Matthew)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: ; ORDERED As requested in the parties' stipulation #6 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to 9/4/19. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/1/19. (CDP)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time for Defendants to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Old Navy, Inc., The Gap Inc.. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Old Navy, Inc.. Parent companies: The Gap, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: The Gap, Inc.,. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Gap Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington for Defendants Old Navy, Inc., The Gap Inc.. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Christopher O. Bauman. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jill Hennessey Process Server: Lousika Legal Courier, LLC (BAK)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7309288, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jill Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bauman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Old Navy, #4 Summons The Gap) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hennessey v. The Gap Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Hennessey
Represented By: Christopher O. Bauman
Represented By: Matthew J. Zevin
Represented By: Scott Kitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gap Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?