SCF Marine, Inc. v. Basin Commerce, Inc.
Plaintiff: SCF Marine, Inc.
Defendant: Basin Commerce, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01881
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 ***REMARK - Sent a certified copy of Default Judgment (doc #11 ) to the defendant at the address listed on the summons returned executed. (KJS)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of SCF Marine, Inc. against Basin Commerce, Inc. - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Clerks Default and Motion for Entry of Default for a Sum Certain [ECF No. #10 ] is GRANTED. Default judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Basin Commerce, Inc., in the sum of $391,709.37. This sum consists of $342,017.70 in unpaid costs, plus interest as of August 8, 2019, in the amount of $49,691.67. Post-judgment interest shall continue at the legal rate as provided by law until paid in full. (KJS)
August 12, 2019 ***REMARK: the Motion for Clerks Default #10 was forwarded to the Clerk of Court/Chief Deputy for ruling. (AAS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Basin Commerce, Inc. by Plaintiff SCF Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Alan K. Goldstein in Support of Motion for Entry of Default and for Default Judgment, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Rick Barbee in Support of Motion for Entry of Default and for Default Judgment)(Goldstein, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by SCF Marine, Inc.. Basin Commerce, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Curtis, Jacob)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff SCF Marine, Inc. Process Server: Metro Legal Services, 330 2nd Avenue South, Suite 150, Minneapolis, MN 55401-2217 (Curtis, Jacob) Modified on 7/10/2019 (KJS).
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Basin Commerce, Inc.. The summons was emailed to Alan K. Goldstein. (AAS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff SCF Marine, Inc.. Parent companies: SEACOR Inland River Transport Inc. and SEACOR Holdings Inc., Publicly held company: BlackRock, Inc.,. (Curtis, Jacob)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff SCF Marine, Inc. Process Server: Hennepin County Sheriff's Office (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Goldstein, Alan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob D. Curtis for Plaintiff SCF Marine, Inc.. (Curtis, Jacob)
July 3, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint Original Filing Form by Plaintiff SCF Marine, Inc.. (Goldstein, Alan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff SCF Marine, Inc.. (Goldstein, Alan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Basin Commerce, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7312020, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by SCF Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goldstein, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCF Marine, Inc. v. Basin Commerce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basin Commerce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCF Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Alan K. Goldstein
Represented By: Jacob D. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?