Alliance Glazing Technologies v. Wheaton & Sprague Engineering Inc.
Plaintiff: Alliance Glazing Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01889
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Strike #6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. (Snodgrass, Gary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. (Snodgrass, Gary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement As to Count I of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Defendant Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. (Snodgrass, Gary)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case As to Counts II through V of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Defendant Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. (Snodgrass, Gary)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case As to Counts II through V of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Plaintiff Alliance Glazing Technologies, Inc.. (Christofferson, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement As to Count I of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Plaintiff Alliance Glazing Technologies, Inc.. (Christofferson, Philip)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case As to Counts II through V of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Defendant Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. (Snodgrass, Gary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case As to Counts II through V of Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. (Snodgrass, Gary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement As to Count I of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Defendant Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. (Snodgrass, Gary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement As to Count I of Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. (Snodgrass, Gary)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Alliance Glazing Technologies, Inc.. (Christofferson, Philip)
July 3, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Alliance Glazing Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BAK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Alliance Glazing Technologies, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Christofferson, Philip)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Philip J. Christofferson for Plaintiff Allied Glazing Technologies, Inc.. (Christofferson, Philip)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven M. Cockriel for Plaintiff Alliance Glazing Technologies, Inc.. (Cockriel, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Snodgrass, Gary)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC02016, with receipt number AMOEDC-7314359, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Snodgrass, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance Glazing Technologies v. Wheaton & Sprague Engineering Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance Glazing Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Philip J. Christofferson
Represented By: Steven M. Cockriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheaton & Sprague Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Gary E. Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?