Terrill v. City of St. Charles et al
Plaintiff: Michael Terrill
Defendant: St. Charles County Department of Corrections, Crawford Larry, City of St. Charles, St. Charles County, John/Jane Does 1-10, Saint Charles County Sheriff's Department, Officer M. Umphries, Corizon, LLC, Larry Crawford, CO. Todd, Capt. O. Echele, CO. C Robinson, Cpl. Baumgartner, CO. Spies, Corizon Health, Inc., CO. Cagle, CO. Lori A Ellsworth and CO. Brazel
Case Number: 4:2019cv01897
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED ANSWER to First #29 Amended Complaint,, amended form filer filed by CO. Lori A Ellsworth, CO. Brazel filed by Defendants CO. Lori A Ellsworth, CO. Brazel. (Heffner, Drew) Added filers James Bumgartner, Michael Umphries, Chad Robinson, Don Spies and Debra Echele on 9/4/2019 (KKS).
September 3, 2019 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Drew A. Heffner for Defendants CO. Lori A Ellsworth, CO. Brazel. (Heffner, Drew)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is hereby deemed filed as of 8/8/2019. All other aspects of Plaintiff's Motion are DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants City of St. Charles, St. Charles County, and Larry Crawford shall respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by 9/3/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #14 Motion to Dismiss Party St. Charles County Department of Corrections and St. Charles County Sheriffs Department is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/21/2019. (CLO)
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant City of St. Charles, St. Charles County, Larry Crawford, CO. Brazel, CO. Cagle, Cpl. Baumgartner, Officer M. Umphries, CO. Lori A Ellsworth, CO. Todd, CO. C Robinson, CO. Spies, Capt. O. Echele, Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, LLC,Terminating John/Jane Does 1-10 (in their individual and official capacities) Amendment to #1 Complaint,, Jury demand,, filed by Michael Terrill. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by Michael Terrill.(CLO) Modified to remove two parties: St. Charles County Department of Corrections and St. Charles County Department of Corrections on 8/23/2019 per Attorney (CLO).
August 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Terrill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint)(Schlapprizzi, Craig)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Docket Text ORDER: Motion for protective order #24 is denied without prejudice. The parties shall define in the protective order "protected health information" and submit an amended protective order for the Court's approval. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Clark on 08/08/19. (Cosgrove, Melissa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Party St. Charles County Department of Corrections and St. Charles County Sheriff's Department filed by Plaintiff Michael Terrill. (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant St. Charles County. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed HIPAA Qualified Protective Order)(Heffner, Drew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Clark: Motion Hearing held by telephone on 8/5/2019 re #16 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel filed by Michael Terrill. Arguments heard. The Court orders the motion granted in part. Defendant is ordered to produce records via email within 48-hours of this Order. If Defendant is unable to produce all of the records requested within 48-hours, Defendant must explain what records are not being produced by the deadline, what methods were taken in effort produce such records by the deadline, and when the records will be produced to Plaintiff. (Court Reporter:Laura Esposito, Laura_Esposito@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7739) (proceedings started: 1:00PM) (proceedings ended: 1:26PM)(Deputy Clerk: J.Bernsen)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Craig Schlapprizzi)(Appearance for Defendant: Drew Heffner) (JAB)
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by Defendant St. Charles County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Subpoena to Ehlman, #2 Errata Exhibit B Subpoena to Keen)(Heffner, Drew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel filed by Defendant St. Charles County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Objections of Daniel Keen and Steve Ehlmann)(Heffner, Drew)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: It is hereby ordered that 17 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Good Cause to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is GRANTED. It is further ordered that a telephone hearing on #16 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel is scheduled for Monday, August 5, 2019 at 1:00 pm. Defendants are ordered to file any response to #16 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel no later than noon on Monday, August 5. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Clark on 08/02/19. (Cosgrove, Melissa)
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Pursuant to the order entered by the Honorable Noelle C. Collins on August 2, 2019, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (KXS)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall randomly reassign this case to a United States District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/2/19. (KXS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Michael Terrill. (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 LIMITED ENTRY of Appearance by Drew A. Heffner for Defendant Saint Charles County Department of Corrections and St. Charles County Sheriff's Department. (Heffner, Drew) Modified on 8/2/2019 (TMT).
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party St. Charles County Department of Corrections and St. Charles County Sheriff's Department by Defendant St. Charles County. (Heffner, Drew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by St. Charles County and Larry Crawford.(Heffner, Drew) Modified on 8/1/2019 (TMT).
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Drew A. Heffner for Defendant St. Charles County and Larry Crawford. (Heffner, Drew) Modified on 8/1/2019 (TMT).
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Michael Terrill. Larry Crawford served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Michael Terrill. St. Charles County Department of Corrections served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Michael Terrill. Saint Charles County Sheriff's Department served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Michael Terrill. City of St. Charles served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Michael Terrill. St. Charles County served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Michael Terrill Process Server: Rufus Harmon (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Larry Crawford. The summons was emailed to Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi. (KJS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Michael Terrill Request for Issuance of Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Larry Crawford)(Schlapprizzi, Craig)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Michael Terrill of Intent To Use Process Server (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 4 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. Service documents not provided for defendant Larry Crawford. (BAK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Michael Terrill Process Server: Mark Smith/Markell & Associates, Inc. (Schlapprizzi, Craig)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Michael Terrill, individually and on behalf of his deceased son, Steven L. Algire Against Defendants against defendant Michael Terrill with receipt number AMOEDC-7318495, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Michael Terrill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons to City of St. Charles, #4 Summons to St. Charles County, #5 Summons to St. Charles County Department of Corrections, #6 Summons to Saint Charles County Sheriff's Department)(Schlapprizzi, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrill v. City of St. Charles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Terrill
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Department of Corrections
Represented By: Drew A. Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford Larry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County
Represented By: Drew A. Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Charles County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Drew A. Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer M. Umphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Crawford
Represented By: Drew A. Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. O. Echele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. C Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Spies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Lori A Ellsworth
Represented By: Drew A. Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Brazel
Represented By: Drew A. Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?